+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 463
- Effective date(s) 05/18/2015
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 87, Nays 2, PNV 1
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/22/2015
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/21/2015
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/16/2015
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2015
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Recalled from Senate Calendar Committee
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/17/2015
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (6)
April 22, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
April 22, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 9
April 21, 2015: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
April 21, 2015: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
March 17, 2015: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
March 17, 2015: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor