+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/19/2019
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/19/2019
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/5/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor