+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2022
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/22/2022
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/16/2022
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/16/2022
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/15/2022
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor