+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/25/2019
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/19/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
February 25, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 9
February 19, 2019: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor