+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 186
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 4/10/2017
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/3/2017
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
April 10, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 8
April 3, 2017: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor