+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 151
- Effective date(s) 04/17/2019
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
- Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0125)
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/4/2019
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0125)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0021)
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/28/2019
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/19/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (4)
April 4, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur Concur in House Amend# 1
- Yeas: 9
April 1, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
February 28, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
February 19, 2019: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor