+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 402
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/29/2021
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/20/2021
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/20/2021
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/14/2021
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/14/2021
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021
- Reset on Final calendar of Senate Judiciary Committee
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/7/2021
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/7/2021
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/6/2021
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
April 20, 2021: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor