+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 367
- Effective date(s)
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0001)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0003)
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/13/2019
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/5/2019
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 1, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96
February 13, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
February 5, 2019: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor