+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/25/2013
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to 3/19/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/18/2013
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal.
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/12/2013
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm.
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.