+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/5/2017
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/5/2017
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/4/2017
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/4/2017
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2017
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 5, 2017: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
April 5, 2017: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor