+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 03/29/2021
- Pub. Ch. 53
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 1
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/22/2021
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/10/2021
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
March 15, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 88
- Present/NV: 1
February 22, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 9
February 10, 2021: SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor