+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/30/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/30/2019
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/29/2019
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/29/2019
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/25/2019
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/25/2019
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019
- Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/24/19
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/17/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/17/2019
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/10/2019
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reset on Final calendar of Senate Education Committee
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/27/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
April 17, 2019: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor