+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. S&L Gov. Comm.
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/26/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Gov. Comm. to 3/26/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2013
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Gov. Comm. to 3/19/2013
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/12/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor