+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/27/2022
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on 1st calendar of 2022
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/3/2021
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/14/2021
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/14/2021
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/13/2021
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
April 14, 2021: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor