+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 224
- Effective date(s) 04/28/2017
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 1
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/27/2017
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/21/2017
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
February 27, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 9
February 21, 2017: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 21, 2017: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor