+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 160
- Effective date(s) 04/12/2013
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 63, Nays 20
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0067)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 23, Nays 7
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0049)
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/4/2013
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- S. Placed on cal. for 3/4/2013
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/26/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA0049
Amendment 1-0 to SB0924
+ − Votes (3)
March 28, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 7
March 4, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 7
February 26, 2013: S. S&L GOVT. COMM.
- Yeas: 9