+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/10/2019
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reset on Final calendar of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/27/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor