+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 05/27/2022
- Pub. Ch. 1085
On May 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 17, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 1 (Amendment 2 - HA0897)
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/27/2022
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/27/2022
On April 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/25/2022
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/25/2022
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/21/2022
On April 18, 2022 in the House:
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0897)
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0798)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0660)
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/24/2022
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2022
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sponsor change.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
April 27, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 2
- Yeas: 9
April 18, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
April 18, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY WHITE PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
March 24, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
March 16, 2022: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor