+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 110
- Effective date(s) 04/11/2019
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 73, Nays 17, PNV 1
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0118)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0107)
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2019
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/13/2019
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee to 3/13/2019
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 2/27/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 1, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 1
March 18, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
March 13, 2019: SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor