+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 218
- Effective date(s) 01/01/2016
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0225)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0264)
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0240)
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/6/2015
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/6/2015
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/2/2015
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/30/2015
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/30/2015
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/24/2015
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/24/2015
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/17/2015
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/17/2015
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/10/2015
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
April 6, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 9
March 30, 2015: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
March 30, 2015: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor