+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 316
- Pub. Ch. 316
- Effective date(s) 04/29/2013
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- S. concurred in H. am. 3
- S. concurred in H. am. 1
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 4/15/2013
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 87, Nays 2
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 3 of 0 - HA0380)
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA0322)
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/10/2013
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Held on desk.
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2013
- Reset on Next Available Reg. cal.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/3/2013
- Reset on Next Available Reg. cal.
- Motion to reconsider adopted.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Reset on Last Reg. cal.
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0169)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- S. Placed on consent cal. 2 for Monday, 3-4-13
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/26/2013
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (5)
April 15, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1
- Yeas: 27
April 15, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 3
- Yeas: 27
April 10, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
March 4, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
February 26, 2013: S. S&L GOVT. COMM.
- Yeas: 9