+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (47)
On November 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 11/12/2021
- Pub. Ch. 6
On November 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On November 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On November 1, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On November 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On October 30, 2021 in the House:
- Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 58, Nays 22 PNV 2
On October 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee report tabled (CC9001)
- Conference Committee report adopted (CC9002) Ayes 22, Nays 4, PNV 0
On October 30, 2021 in the House:
- Conf. comm. appointed. (Zachary, Terry, Smith, Rudd, Lamberth, Todd, Beck, Shaw)
On October 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 25, Nays 6
On October 29, 2021 in the House:
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - HA9013)
On October 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 10/29/2021
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA9007)
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA9008)
- Amendment tabled (Amendment 3 - SA9011)
- Amendment tabled (Amendment 4 - SA9012)
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On October 29, 2021 in the House:
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 4 - HA9015)
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 5 - HA9016)
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 6 - HA9017)
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 13 - HA9028)
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA9008)
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA9012)
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 14 - HA9029)
- Passed H., Ayes 62, Nays 20, PNV 1
On October 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate refused to concur in House amendments 12, 13, and 14.
On October 29, 2021 in the House:
- H. refused to recede from am. HA12, 13, 14
- Conf. comm. appointed. (Zachary, Terry, Smith, Rudd, Lamberth, Todd, Beck, Shaw)
On October 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate refused to recede from its non-concurrence.
- Conference Committee appointed. (Johnson, Bell, Watson, Bailey, White, Akbari, Yarbro)
On October 29, 2021 in the House:
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 8 - HA9021)
On October 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 10/28/2021
- Reset on Final calendar of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 10/28/2021
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 10/28/2021
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 10/28/2021
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 10/29/2021
On October 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
+ − Amendments (18)
+ − Votes (22)
October 30, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Previous Question Conference Committee Report
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
October 30, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Conference Committee Report
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Table Amend# 4 by Yarbro
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 12 BY ZACHARY PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 69
- Present/NV: 1
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 13 BY TODD PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 69
- Present/NV: 1
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 14 BY GARRETT PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 69
- Present/NV: 1
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 10 BY HARDAWAY PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 69
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 11 BY HARDAWAY PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 69
- Present/NV: 1
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 12 BY ZACHARY PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 69
- Present/NV: 1
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 13 BY TODD PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 69
- Present/NV: 1
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 14 BY GARRETT PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 69
- Present/NV: 1
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 7 BY HARDAWAY PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 69
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 9 BY HARDAWAY PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 69
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 69
- Present/NV: 1
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 12 BY ZACHARY PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 69
- Present/NV: 1
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 13 BY TODD PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 69
- Present/NV: 1
October 29, 2021: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE:
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 69
- Present/NV: 1
October 28, 2021: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
October 28, 2021: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
October 28, 2021: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor