+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On November 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 3
On October 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 10/29/2021
- Companion House Bill substituted
On October 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 10/28/2021
- Reset on Final calendar of Senate State and Local Government Committee
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 10/29/2021
On October 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
+ − Vote
October 29, 2021: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor