+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On October 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee, Ayes 2, Nays 7
On October 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 10/28/2021
- Reset on Final calendar of Senate State and Local Government Committee
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 10/29/2021
On October 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
October 29, 2021: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor