+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On November 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 2
On October 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 10/29/2021
- Companion House Bill substituted
On October 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 10/28/2021
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On October 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
+ − Vote
October 28, 2021: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor