+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On November 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1
On October 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 10/29/2021
- Companion House Bill substituted
On October 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 10/28/2021
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0
On October 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
+ − Amendments (9)
+ − Vote
October 28, 2021: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor