+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On November 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 11/12/2021
- Pub. Ch. 5
On November 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On November 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On November 1, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On November 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On October 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 10/29/2021
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA9005)
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 25, Nays 6
On October 29, 2021 in the House:
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On October 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On October 29, 2021 in the House:
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA9007)
- Passed H., Ayes 64, Nays 17, PNV 4
On October 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 10/28/2021
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0
On October 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 4
October 28, 2021: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor