+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On November 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 11/12/2021
- Pub. Ch. 7
On November 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On November 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On November 1, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On November 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On October 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 10/29/2021
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 10/29/2021
On October 29, 2021 in the House:
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On October 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 24, Nays 5
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On October 29, 2021 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 73, Nays 13, PNV 0
On October 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On October 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
+ − Votes (2)
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor