+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 436
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/2/2019
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/26/2019
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 24, 2019: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
April 2, 2019: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor