+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 1/18/2016
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/1/2015
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/1/2015
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/25/2015
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor