+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 978
- Effective date(s) 05/22/2014
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed S., Ayes 30, Nays 0
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/24/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Trans & Safety Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
March 24, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 30
March 19, 2014: S. TRANS & SAFETY COMM.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor