+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (3)
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
April 21, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
April 20, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
April 13, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
March 10, 2015: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor