+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 422
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reset on Final calendar of Senate Judiciary Committee
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
April 23, 2019: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor