+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 246
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 4/10/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 4/10/2019
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 4/3/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
April 10, 2019: TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor