+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (40)
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 423
- Effective date(s) 05/16/2013
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 1 - SA0531)
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA0528)
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0193)
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0203)
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA0578)
- Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 cal. for 4/18/2013
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/17/2013
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/16/2013
- Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/17/2013
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/16/2013
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/15/2013
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/15/2013
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/11/2013
- Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/11/2013
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/10/2013
- Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/10/2013
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/9/2013
- Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/9/2013
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2013
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. E,A&NR Comm. cal. for 3/20/2013
- Action Def. in S. E,A&NR Comm. to 3/20/2013
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. E,A&NR Comm. cal. for 3/13/2013
- Action Def. in S. E,A&NR to 3/13/2013
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. E,A&NR Comm. cal. for 3/6/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. E,A&NR Comm.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 18, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
April 18, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 31
April 17, 2013: S. FW&M COMM.
- Yeas: 11
March 20, 2013: S. E,A&NR COMM.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor