+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 274
- Effective date(s) 05/04/2017
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 1
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0495)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0305)
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2017
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/4/2017
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/4/2017
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/3/2017
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/4/2017
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/28/2017
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 24, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 90
April 19, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 8
April 4, 2017: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor