+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 206
- Effective date(s) 04/25/2019
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0225)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0231)
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/8/2019
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 4/3/2019
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 4/3/2019
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/20/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 15, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO WITHDRAW AMENDMENT # 1 BY HOWELL PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96
April 8, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
April 3, 2019: TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor