+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 222
- Effective date(s) 04/28/2017
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 28, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0320)
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0320)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/17/2017
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/13/2017
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/7/2017
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
April 17, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1
- Yeas: 9
April 13, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
March 13, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 9
March 7, 2017: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor