+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 528
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/29/2021
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/28/2021
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/20/2021
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/20/2021
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/14/2021
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/14/2021
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Vote
April 20, 2021: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Johnson
Type:
Primary Sponsor