+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 54
- Effective date(s) 04/06/2015
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment 1
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/16/2015
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/10/2015
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/10/2015
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/3/2015
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/3/2015
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/24/2015
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/17/2015
On January 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
- Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments.
On January 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 23, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
March 16, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 9
March 10, 2015: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
March 10, 2015: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor