+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 283
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/15/2015
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/14/2015
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/7/2015
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 7, 2015: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
April 7, 2015: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1