+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/16/2015
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2015
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/3/2015
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 3, 2015: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Yeas: 7
March 3, 2015: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor