+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
- Failed to pass S., Ayes 13, Nays 11, PNV 3
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/15/2013
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- S. Reset on Cal. for 4/15/2013
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/10/2013
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/26/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Gov. Comm. to 3/26/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
April 15, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 3
March 26, 2013: S. S&L GOVT. COMM.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor