+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 476
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Companion House Bill substituted
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 5/9/2017
- Senate Reset on calendar for 5-9-17
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 5/8/2017
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2017
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2017
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2017
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee / Behind Budget
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/12/2017
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/12/2017
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/11/2017
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2017
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/28/2017
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2017
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
May 3, 2017: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
March 28, 2017: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
March 28, 2017: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor