+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2017
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/22/2017
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2017
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/21/2017
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/15/2017
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/15/2017
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/14/2017
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/14/2017
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/8/2017
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/8/2017
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/7/2017
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 22, 2017: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor