+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 505
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/23/2019
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/16/2019
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 24, 2019: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
April 9, 2019: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (4)
Johnson
Type:
Primary Sponsor