+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/6/2019
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
On January 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, Held on desk pending committee appointments
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On December 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction