+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 202
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2019
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/28/2019
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/26/2019
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/19/2019
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2019
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (4)
April 11, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 89
March 28, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
March 26, 2019: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
March 5, 2019: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Yeas: 9