+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 05/13/2021
- Pub. Ch. 445
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/29/2021
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/24/2021
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/24/2021
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/23/2021
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
April 27, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
March 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 8
March 24, 2021: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor