+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/18/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. E,A&NR Comm. cal. for 3/13/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. E,A&NR Comm.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
March 18, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
March 13, 2013: S. E,A&NR COMM.
- Yeas: 9